MN HF3223 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy and provider choice allowed relating to biological product dispensing and prescribing.
Title
Pharmacy and provider choice allowed relating to biological product dispensing and prescribing.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Bierman |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3400 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Author added Klein