MN HF3205 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Authors added Her, Pinto
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Authors added Her, Pinto
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State rent assistance program established for all low-income, cost-burdened households; and money appropriated.
Title
State rent assistance program established for all low-income, cost-burdened households; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Authors added Her, Pinto |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Lippert |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3394 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Author added Dibble