MN HF3200 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transitional housing program modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Transitional housing program modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; Hornstein |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Elkins; Long; and Hansen, R. |
2022-02-16 | House | Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2949 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy