MN HF3199 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military code scope clarified.
Title
Military code scope clarified.
Sponsors
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3002 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3002, now on General Orders |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-09 | House | Bill was passed vote: 120-0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 09, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3002 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3199