MN HF3195 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Roseau County; Trunk Highway 11 segment designated as Patrol Inspector Robert H. Lobdell Memorial Highway.
Title
Roseau County; Trunk Highway 11 segment designated as Patrol Inspector Robert H. Lobdell Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3190 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy