MN HF3195 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Council of Health Boards required to study and make recommendations on increasing access to clinical experiences through the use of technology, and money appropriated.
Title
Council of Health Boards required to study and make recommendations on increasing access to clinical experiences through the use of technology, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to re-refer Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2887 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy