MN HF3172 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus supplemental appropriations bill.
Title
Omnibus supplemental appropriations bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-16 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To re-refer to Finance (Y: 27 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 100 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 70 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 69 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 79 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-16 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To re-refer to Finance (Y: 27 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 100 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 70 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 69 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 79 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 312 | |
2014-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 37-22 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-16 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 75-55 |
2014-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-16 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-16 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-15 | House | Author added Hausman |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees Cohen; Tomassoni; Lourey; Wiger; Bonoff |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House conferees Carlson; Huntley; Mahoney; Marquart; Wagenius |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2014-04-10 | House | Senate conferees Cohen, Tomassoni, Lourey, Wiger, Bonoff |
2014-04-10 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2014-04-09 | House | House conferees Carlson, Huntley, Mahoney, Marquart, Wagenius |
2014-04-09 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2014-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 37-27 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Motion did not prevail To re-refer to Finance vote: 27-38 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-03 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 70-59 |
2014-04-03 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-04-03 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2014-04-03 | House | Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2785 (Similar To) 2014-04-04 - HF substituted in committee HF3172