MN HF3162 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis; manufacturers allowed to distribute medical cannabis to Tribal medical cannabis program patients, transportation of medical cannabis provided by manufacturers registered with a Tribal medical cannabis program, protections extended, and criminal penalty modified.
Title
Cannabis; manufacturers allowed to distribute medical cannabis to Tribal medical cannabis program patients, transportation of medical cannabis provided by manufacturers registered with a Tribal medical cannabis program, protections extended, and criminal penalty modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3981 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy