MN HF3162 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; alternative mechanism provided for prompt payment of emergency room and ambulance charges incurred by patients enrolled in very high deductible health plans.
Title
Health insurance; alternative mechanism provided for prompt payment of emergency room and ambulance charges incurred by patients enrolled in very high deductible health plans.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Backer |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Nornes |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3157 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Westrom