MN HF3144 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Author added Brynaert
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Author added Brynaert
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Minnesota State Colleges and Universities; Board of Trustees funding provided for compensation costs associated with the settlement of employment contracts, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota State Colleges and Universities; Board of Trustees funding provided for compensation costs associated with the settlement of employment contracts, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Author added Brynaert |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-03-19 | House | Authors added Ward, J.E.; Lillie; Nornes; Persell; Fritz; Johnson, S.; Fischer; Johnson, C.; Sawatzky; and Savick |
2014-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |