MN HF3133 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic partner benefits modified.
Title
Domestic partner benefits modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Margaret Kelliher [D] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Anthony Sertich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-08 | House: Author added Murphy, E. | |
2010-03-01 | House: Author changed Loeffler (chief) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Author added Kahn | |
2010-02-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development Finance and Policy Division |