MN HF3131 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate Compact for Juveniles adopted.
Title
Interstate Compact for Juveniles adopted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division | |
2010-03-23 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | House: Author added Sterner | |
2010-03-11 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2010-03-05 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-03-02 | House: Referred by Chair to Crime Victims/Criminal Records Division | |
2010-02-22 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF3131&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF3131.0.pdf |