MN HF3127 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Parent Representation in Child Protection Proceedings Task Force created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parent Representation in Child Protection Proceedings Task Force created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2020-03-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2020-03-05HouseAuthor added Albright
2020-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division

Same As/Similar To

SF3245 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Author added Latz

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback