MN HF3123 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sudden cardiac arrest prevention standards, safety and awareness education, and required training for coaches and officials of youth activities established.
Title
Sudden cardiac arrest prevention standards, safety and awareness education, and required training for coaches and officials of youth activities established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Her |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Koznick |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Sparks