MN HF312 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-25 - Authors added Erhardt, Pierson, and Hancock.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-25 - Authors added Erhardt, Pierson, and Hancock.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Military retirement pay subtraction phase-in provided.
Title
Military retirement pay subtraction phase-in provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Anna Wills [R] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] |
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. David Hancock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Authors added Erhardt, Pierson, and Hancock. |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Isaacson. |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-02-09 | House | Author added Wills. |
2015-02-05 | House | Author added Atkins. |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF294 (Similar To) 2015-01-26 - Referred to Taxes