MN HF310 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lawful gambling organizations annual audits and report requirements modified.
Title
Lawful gambling organizations annual audits and report requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Haley |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF435 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections