MN HF3093 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act established, continuing education on implicit bias required, and maternal death studies conducted by the commissioner of health expanded to include maternal morbidity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dignity in Pregnancy and Childbirth Act established, continuing education on implicit bias required, and maternal death studies conducted by the commissioner of health expanded to include maternal morbidity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2020-03-11HouseAuthor added Morrison
2020-03-04HouseAuthor added Halverson
2020-03-02HouseAuthor added Olson
2020-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF3173 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback