MN HF305 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
White-tailed deer possession moratorium provided, buyout program created, and money appropriated.
Title
White-tailed deer possession moratorium provided, buyout program created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. John Persell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Persell |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Lillie and Tabke |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Nelson |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF874 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy