MN HF3035 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Southwest light rail transit project special review or program evaluation required by legislative auditor, and money appropriated.
Title
Southwest light rail transit project special review or program evaluation required by legislative auditor, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] |
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3035 (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment as amended - H3035A4 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: 0 - Amendment to Petersburg Amendment - Nays (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment as amended - H3035A4 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: 0 - Amendment to Petersburg Amendment - Nays (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 39 | |
2022-03-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-03-24 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-03-24 | Governor approval | |
2022-03-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-03-14 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2676 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2676 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Hertaus and Nash |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-03-03 | House | Amended |
2022-03-03 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken multiple points of order |
2022-03-03 | House | Amendments offered |
2022-03-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 3, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Albright |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2676 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3035