MN HF3024 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Author added West.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Author added West.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health plan company prohibited from contractually preventing a pharmacist from informing a patient of a price differential, and standard for prescription cost to consumers established.
Title
Health plan company prohibited from contractually preventing a pharmacist from informing a patient of a price differential, and standard for prescription cost to consumers established.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Author added West. |
2018-05-03 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-03 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2836 |
2018-04-24 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2018-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-28 | House | Authors added Loeffler and Hornstein. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Munson |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Loonan. |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2836 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Second reading