MN HF300 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol flag program established for families of military service members and first responders who die in the line of duty.
Title
Capitol flag program established for families of military service members and first responders who die in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] |
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Raleigh and Nelson, M. |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Nash |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | House | Authors added Bahner, Klevorn and Elkins |
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Youakim and Edelson |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF485 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance