MN HF30 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Authors added Boe, Franke, and Reyer
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Environment and natural resources trust fund money appropriated, and previous appropriations modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and natural resources trust fund money appropriated, and previous appropriations modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseAuthors added Boe, Franke, and Reyer
2021-01-14HouseAuthors added Hornstein; Stephenson; Hanson, J.; Xiong, J.; Vang; Masin; Howard; Pinto; and Davids
2021-01-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2021-01-11HouseAuthors added Becker-Finn, Acomb, Lippert, Wazlawik, Morrison
2021-01-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF166 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback