MN HF3 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

REAL ID Act implementation authorized, driver's license and Minnesota identification card requirements amended, data practices provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ID Act implementation authorized, driver's license and Minnesota identification card requirements amended, data practices provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House: Refuse to Concur (Y: 75 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Failed to pass (Y: 29 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 85 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Secretary of State Chapter 76
2017-05-18 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-18HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 57-8
2017-05-17 Presented to Governor
2017-05-17SenateThird reading vote: 57-8
2017-05-17SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2017-05-17SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2017-05-17SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2017-05-17HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 120-11
2017-05-17HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2017-05-17HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2017-05-17HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2017-04-18HouseSenate conferees Pratt, Newman, Rest
2017-04-18HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2017-04-04SenateSenate conferees Pratt; Newman; Rest
2017-04-03SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2017-04-03SenateHouse conferees Smith; Torkelson; Pelowski
2017-04-03SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2017-03-31HouseHouse conferees Smith, Torkelson, Pelowski
2017-03-31HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2017-03-31HouseMotion to refuse to concur vote: 75-54
2017-03-31HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-03-30SenateThird reading Passed vote: 60-7
2017-03-30SenateAmended
2017-03-30SenateTaken from table
2017-03-08SenateLaid on table
2017-03-08SenateReconsidered (voice vote)
2017-03-06SenateThird reading Failed to pass vote: 29-38
2017-03-06SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2017-03-01SenateSecond reading
2017-03-01SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2017-02-27SenateReferred to Finance
2017-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-02-27SenateReceived from House
2017-02-23HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 72-58
2017-02-23HouseThird reading as amended
2017-02-23HouseAmended
2017-02-22HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 23, 2017
2017-01-26HouseSecond reading
2017-01-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2017-01-19HouseAuthor added Albright.
2017-01-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2017-01-12HouseAuthor added Christensen.
2017-01-12HouseAuthors stricken Lillie and Nelson.
2017-01-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
2017-01-11HouseAuthor added Nelson.
2017-01-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy
2017-01-09HouseAuthors added Torkelson, Layman, Kiel, Lillie, Pelowski, Lueck, and Uglem.
2017-01-05HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF166 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - HF substituted in committee HF3

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0003&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3&version=4&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3&version=5&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0003&session_number=0&year=2017&id=56
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0003&session_number=0&year=2017&id=57
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0003&session_number=0&year=2017&id=58
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=1120
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=2710
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0003&session_number=0&year=2017&id=132
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=5379
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF0003&session_number=0&year=2017&id=298

Bill Comments

feedback