MN HF3 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Author added Daniels.
Pending: House Aging and Long-Term Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Author added Daniels.
Pending: House Aging and Long-Term Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing facility employee scholarship costs modified, long-term care savings plan provided, income tax subtraction for contributions made to the long-term care savings plan provided, credit provided for the additional tax paid on early withdrawals from retirement accounts if used for long-term care expenses, and money appropriated.
Title
Nursing facility employee scholarship costs modified, long-term care savings plan provided, income tax subtraction for contributions made to the long-term care savings plan provided, credit provided for the additional tax paid on early withdrawals from retirement accounts if used for long-term care expenses, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Tara Mack [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] |
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Author added Daniels. |
2015-02-05 | House | Author added Atkins |
2015-01-12 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |