MN HF2989 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Watershed management organization planning requirements modified, and watershed district purpose modified.
Title
Watershed management organization planning requirements modified, and watershed district purpose modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] |
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Dario Anselmo [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Anselmo. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3407 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance