MN HF2967 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Property and Local Tax Division
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Property and Local Tax Division
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage financing allowed for manufactured homes in manufactured home park cooperatives.
Title
Mortgage financing allowed for manufactured homes in manufactured home park cooperatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Property and Local Tax Division |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Bahr |
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Koegel |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Kiel |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3251 (Similar To) 2020-05-12 - Senate file first reading, referred to Property and Local Tax Division