MN HF2950 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children and family services, health care, chemical and mental health services, continuing care, and operations obsolete provisions removed; and elderly waiver, alternative care program, and mental health services for children governing provisions modified.
Title
Children and family services, health care, chemical and mental health services, continuing care, and operations obsolete provisions removed; and elderly waiver, alternative care program, and mental health services for children governing provisions modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 262 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-13 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 130-0 |
2014-05-13 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-05-13 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-13 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-05-13 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-13 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Third reading Passed as amended vote: 60-0 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2397 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2397, now on General Orders |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-06 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 126-0 |
2014-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-06 | House | Amended |
2014-05-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 6, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2014-04-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 9, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law |
2014-03-12 | House | Author added Laine |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |