MN HF2949 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Treatment works allocation and interceptors reserved capacity costs provisions modified.
Title
Treatment works allocation and interceptors reserved capacity costs provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Governor approval April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Secretary of State Chapter 212 04/01/10 | |
2010-04-01 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-03-29 | House: Returned from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-29 | Presentment date | |
2010-03-29 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-26 | Senate: Comm report: Subst. for SF on Calendar SF2925 | |
2010-03-25 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-03-25 | House: Third reading | |
2010-03-25 | House: Amendments offered | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-03-24 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-08 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred by Chair to Local Government Division | |
2010-02-15 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |