MN HF294 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health plan contracts and stop loss coverage regulated.
Title
Health plan contracts and stop loss coverage regulated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 91 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF300 |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF300, now on General Orders |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-04-30 | House | Bill was passed vote: 91-38 |
2015-04-30 | House | Third reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendments offered |
2015-04-28 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 30, 2015. |
2015-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF300 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - HF substituted on General Orders HF294