MN HF286 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil legal services funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Civil legal services funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-01-26 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-01-18 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF357 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - Author added Pappas