MN HF2852 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus game and fish bill.
Title
Omnibus game and fish bill.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dill [D] | Sen. Matt Schmit [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 18 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 116 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 18 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 116 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 290 | |
2014-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 62-0 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Third reading vote: 62-0 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-15 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-14 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 129-1 |
2014-05-14 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-14 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-14 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-13 | House | Senate conferees Schmit, Hoffman, and Ruud |
2014-05-13 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate conferees Schmit; Hoffman; Ruud |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | House conferees Dill; Isaacson; McNamara |
2014-05-12 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-05-09 | House | House conferees Dill, Isaacson, McNamara |
2014-05-09 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-05-09 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-1 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2227 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2227, now on General Orders |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-05 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 130-0 |
2014-05-05 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-05 | House | Amended |
2014-05-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 5, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |