MN HF2839 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health maintenance organizations that are corporations required to be organized a nonprofit corporations in order to operate in the state, and use of net earnings of nonprofit health maintenance organizations requirements established.
Title
Health maintenance organizations that are corporations required to be organized a nonprofit corporations in order to operate in the state, and use of net earnings of nonprofit health maintenance organizations requirements established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-02-22 | House | Authors added Davnie, Koegel, Olson, and Bly. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2872 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy