MN HF2833 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Munson.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Munson.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tip income subtraction allowed, and withholding requirements modified.
Title
Tip income subtraction allowed, and withholding requirements modified.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Rep. Drew Christensen [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Munson. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Christensen, Lucero, and Bahr, C. |
2018-02-22 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2566 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Taxes