MN HF2824 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Used motor vehicle pricing disclosure required.
Title
Used motor vehicle pricing disclosure required.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Hansen, R. |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Gomez |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Lee (chief author), Hollins |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3835 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Author added Dibble