MN HF2821 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - Bill was passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - Bill was passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Reserve Bank disclosure of taxpayer return information authorized for study.
Title
Federal Reserve Bank disclosure of taxpayer return information authorized for study.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 116 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-18 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 18, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-05-15 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Lesch as chief author |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |