MN HF28 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-22 - House: Referred by Chair to K-12 Education Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-22 - House: Referred by Chair to K-12 Education Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wind generator at the Minnesota State Academies funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Wind generator at the Minnesota State Academies funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-22 | House: Referred by Chair to K-12 Education Finance Division | |
2009-12-22 | House: Recalled by Chair Finance | |
2009-03-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Finance Division | |
2009-03-12 | House: Division action, without further recommendation to amend and return to Finance | |
2009-01-22 | House: Referred by Chair to K-12 Education Finance Division | |
2009-01-22 | House: Recalled by Chair Finance | |
2009-01-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-01-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Finance Division |