MN HF2764 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 103 04/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Business corporations, nonprofit corporations, limited partnerships, and limited liability companies regulated; and conversions and domestications provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business corporations, nonprofit corporations, limited partnerships, and limited liability companies regulated; and conversions and domestications provided.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30 Secretary of State Chapter 103 04/25/18
2018-04-25 Governor's action Approval
2018-04-25 Secretary of State, Filed
2018-04-25 Governor approval
2018-04-23 Presented to Governor
2018-04-19HouseReturned from Senate
2018-04-19SenateThird reading Passed vote: 57-0
2018-04-19SenateSpecial Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
2018-03-15SenateSecond reading
2018-03-15SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2467
2018-03-14SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2467, now on General Orders
2018-03-14SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-03-14SenateReceived from House
2018-03-12HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 130-0
2018-03-12HouseThird reading as amended
2018-03-12HouseAmended
2018-03-08HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March12, 2018
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading
2018-03-01HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-02-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
2018-02-20HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2467 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2764

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2764&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2764&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2764&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2764&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2764&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF2764&session_number=0&year=2017&id=364
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=7743

Bill Comments

feedback