MN HF2763 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Minnesota Housing Finance Agency obsolete, redundant, and unnecessary laws and rules repealed, conforming changes made, and State Register notice requirement changed.
Title
Minnesota Housing Finance Agency obsolete, redundant, and unnecessary laws and rules repealed, conforming changes made, and State Register notice requirement changed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-03 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2569 |
2014-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |