MN HF2754 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-16 - House: Authors added Sterner and Loeffler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-16 - House: Authors added Sterner and Loeffler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of state filings regulated.
Title
Secretary of state filings regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-16 | House: Authors added Sterner and Loeffler | |
2010-04-15 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Finance | |
2010-02-18 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division | |
2010-02-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF2754&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF2754.0.pdf |