MN HF2749 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus supplemental budget bill.
Title
Omnibus supplemental budget bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-22 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 84 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Appeal ruling of Speaker (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 52 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 84 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Appeal ruling of Speaker (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 52 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Secretary of State Chapter 189 | |
2016-06-01 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-06-01 | Governor approval | |
2016-05-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Third reading vote: 50-16 |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2016-05-22 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2016-05-22 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2016-05-22 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 95-39 |
2016-05-22 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2016-05-22 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2016-05-22 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2016-05-09 | House | Senate conferees Cohen, Wiger, Lourey, Saxhaug, Fischbach |
2016-05-09 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate conferees Cohen; Wiger; Lourey; Saxhaug; Fischbach |
2016-05-04 | House | House conferees Knoblach; Loon; Garofalo; Dean, M.; and McNamara. |
2016-05-04 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House conferees Knoblach; Loon; Garofalo; Dean, M.; McNamara |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-24 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to re-refer to Finance vote: 27-36 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2356 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2356, now on General Orders |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2016-04-25 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 84-46 |
2016-04-25 | House | Third reading as amended |
2016-04-25 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken Multiple points of order. |
2016-04-25 | House | Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | Authors added Loon and Nornes. |
2016-04-21 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 25, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Second reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2356 (Similar To) 2016-04-27 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2749