MN HF2746 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced practice registered nurse practice modified, and health professionals permitted to authorize prescription eyeglasses using old lenses or last prescription available modified.
Title
Advanced practice registered nurse practice modified, and health professionals permitted to authorize prescription eyeglasses using old lenses or last prescription available modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 100 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 100 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 170 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 128-0 |
2018-05-15 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2018-05-15 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2018-05-15 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2018-05-14 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3318 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3318, now on General Orders |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill was passed vote: 100-26 |
2018-05-07 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 07, 2018 |
2018-03-05 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3318 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2746