MN HF2738 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Defense board funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Public Defense board funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Reyer |
2022-02-01 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Fischer |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF4210 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy