MN HF2732 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Authors added Jurgens, Rasmusson
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Authors added Jurgens, Rasmusson
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voter ID required to register and vote, absentee ballot provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Voter ID required to register and vote, absentee ballot provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Jurgens, Rasmusson |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Akland |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Bliss |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Haley |
2022-02-03 | House | Authors added Urdahl, Heintzeman, Pfarr, Novotny, and Nash |
2022-02-01 | House | Authors added Burkel, Heinrich, Poston, Raleigh, O'Driscoll, Dettmer, Bennett, Quam, Franson, Davids, Lucero, Mueller, Daniels, Erickson, Gruenhagen, Kiel, Backer, Petersburg, Robbins, Igo, Anderson, Lueck, Koznick |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2896 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Author added Westrom