MN HF271 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Mekeland
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion prohibited when a fetal heartbeat is detected with certain exceptions, and penalties provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion prohibited when a fetal heartbeat is detected with certain exceptions, and penalties provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Mekeland
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Heinrich
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Lucero
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Dettmer, Scott, and Poston
2019-01-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF869 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback