MN HF2701 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental funding established for youth intervention program grant receipts, and money appropriated.
Title
Supplemental funding established for youth intervention program grant receipts, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Raleigh, Poston |
2022-02-28 | House | Authors added Grossell and Johnson |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Her |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Howard |
2022-02-03 | House | Authors added Huot, Freiberg, Youakim, Koegel, Feist, Hollins, and Long |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3368 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Authors added Dibble; Latz