MN HF2699 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Parenting presumptions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parenting presumptions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseSecond reading
2018-03-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-03-22HouseAuthor added Dehn, R.
2018-03-19HouseAuthor added Howe.
2018-03-05HouseAuthor added Scott added as chief author.
2018-02-22HouseAuthor added Jurgens.
2018-02-20HouseAuthor added Dettmer.
2017-05-21HouseAuthor added Pugh.
2017-05-19HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2413 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Author added Abeler

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback