MN HF269 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher contract qualified economic offer provided.
Title
Teacher contract qualified economic offer provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Downey [R] | Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Pat Mazorol [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-27 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2011-02-24 | House | Author added Lohmer |
2011-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Reform |