MN HF268 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Erickson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; right to carry without a permit provided, and option permit to carry provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; right to carry without a permit provided, and option permit to carry provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Erickson
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Heintzeman
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Heinrich
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Mekeland.
2019-01-31HouseAuthors added Lucero, Daniels
2019-01-28HouseAuthor added Gruenhagen
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Albright, Miller, and Poston
2019-01-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF748 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback