MN HF2669 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School performance report requirements modified, advisory task force established, and money appropriated.
Title
School performance report requirements modified, advisory task force established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-04-05 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2628 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Author added Wiger