MN HF2660 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 200 05/06/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 200 05/06/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Forma pauperis party proceeding partial payment or reimbursement of costs amended.
Title
Forma pauperis party proceeding partial payment or reimbursement of costs amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Secretary of State Chapter 200 05/06/14 | |
2014-05-06 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-05 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | House | Returned from Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2244 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2244, now on General Orders |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2014-04-22 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 22, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-17 | House | Author added Pugh |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Policy |